+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 545.) To printer.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor