+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
- Taken from Second Reading File.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
- Taken from Second Reading File.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 20, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 18, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
April 16, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor