+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 349.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 743 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 743.) To printer.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 416.) To printer.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.