+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 553.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report adopted by Senate. To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 966 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 751 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 751 not concurred in. Senate Amendment No. 966 concurred in. To Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 966.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) To printer.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor