+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 145.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 303.) To printer.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor