+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.