+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 416.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
- In Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
- Exemption effective.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 190.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 16, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor