+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 72.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor