+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On June 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 864.) To printer.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 117.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor