+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 570.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 121.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor