+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 100.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On March 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor