+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 89.
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
On April 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor