+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
On March 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor