+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456.
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On June 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
- In Senate.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 807.) To printer.
- Placed on General File.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
- Taken from General File.
On April 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 514.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
May 27, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor