+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 385.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 674 concurred in.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 123.) To printer.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
- Taken from Second Reading File.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 15, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor