+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 233.) To printer.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor