+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 297.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- Read second time.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 235.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor