+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message. Bill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 17, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 55.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor