+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 157 concurred in. To enrollment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 157.) To printer.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (25)
Assemblywoman Sarah Peters
Type:
Primary Sponsor