+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On April 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 12
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
February 20, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
February 17, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor