+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 104.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 373.) To printer.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor