+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 937 concurred in.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 937.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 249.) To printer.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor