+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 767 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 767 not concurred in. To Senate.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 767.) To printer.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 1, Excused: 3, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor