+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 538 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 538.) To printer.
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On March 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor