+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 274.
On May 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 856 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 856.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 628.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 605.) To printer.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor