+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 73.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.