+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 127.) To printer.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.