+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 72.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor