+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 388.
On June 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment No. 961 concurred in. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 961.) To printer.
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On June 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 862.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On April 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.
On February 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor