+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 606.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1045.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To printer.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 84.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Assemblywoman Selena Torres
Type:
Primary Sponsor