+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 771 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 771.) To printer.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate.
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 349.) To printer.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor