+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor