+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Bill read with Governor's veto message. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On June 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On May 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On April 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
On April 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 12.) To printer.
On April 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor