+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 170.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) To printer.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor