+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231.
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor