+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 350.
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 741 concurred in.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 741.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 34.) To printer.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
- Taken from Second Reading File.
On April 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 27, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 19, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 15, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor