+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 272.
On May 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment No. 898 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 898.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
On April 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 135.) To printer.
On April 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor