+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) To printer.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
April 15, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor