+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 52.
On May 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) To printer.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.