+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 610 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
On April 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 172.) To printer.
On February 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.