+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 340.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 719 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 719.) To printer.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 17.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.