+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 891.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 12, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To printer.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) To printer.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.