+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 168.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 232.) To printer.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 29, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
May 22, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
May 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
April 14, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor