+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
On May 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 122.) To printer.
On April 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. Read first time. To committee.
On February 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor