+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 129.) To printer.
On March 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor