+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
On May 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
- In Senate.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Votes (6)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 23, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 23, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
April 22, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
March 20, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor