+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 9.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. Read first time. To committee.
On February 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor