+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution
On February 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Erdman name added
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2019
On January 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Halloran name added
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Briese name added
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (4)
Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor