+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Enrolled resolution
- Correctly enrolled
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Adopted
- Chambers FA357 lost
- Chambers FA357 filed
- Agriculture AM2371 adopted
On March 12, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM2371 filed
- Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM2371
On January 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 25, 2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Speaker's announcement
- Laid over
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Chambers FA357
lost
Agriculture AM2371
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor