+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Mello name added
- Adopted
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM758 lost
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution.
On April 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM758 filed
- Reported to Legislature for further consideration with AM758
On February 27, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 07, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Speaker's announcement
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Laid over
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor